Watson v. Denmark
Plaintiff: Dexter Watson
Defendant: Johnnie Denmark
Case Number: 5:2014cv00108
Filed: November 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Claiborne
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 46 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 47 Motion for Certificate of Appealability Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on December 5, 2017 (JBR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING 31 Report and Recommendations - The petitioner Dexter Watson's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (docket entry 1 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. A Final Judgment dismissing Watson's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus will follow in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 10/18/2017 (ND)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 8/7/2017 (EB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Denmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Denmark
Represented By: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?