Lefoldt v. Rentfro et al
Plaintiff: H. Kenneth Lefoldt, Jr.
Defendant: Donald Rentfro, Charles Mock, William Heburn, LeRoy White, John Serafin, Linda Godley, Lionel Stepter, Lee Martin, William Ernst, Jennifer Russ and Horne, LLP
Case Number: 5:2015cv00096
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 157 Motion to Stay Discovery; denying 161 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 163 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/14/18. (cb)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 131 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 148 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 12/1/17. (cb)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to 148 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment within fourteen days of its filing but no later than June 22, 2017. If Defendant wants to reply, it may do so within seven days of the filing of the response, but no later than June 29, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/9/2017 (dtj)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 131 within seven days of its filing, but no later than May 17, 2017. If Defendant wants to reply, it may do so within seven days of the filing of the response, but no later than May 24, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/4/2017 (dtj)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying 94 Motion Transfer Venue to Another Division Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/3/2017 (dtj)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying without prejudice 119 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 10, 2017. (jg)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 38 40 48 Motions to Dismiss; and denying Defendant Horne, LLP's 23 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Individual Defendants William Heburn, Charles Mock, Donald Rentfro, Leroy White, John Serafin, Linda Godley, Lee Martin, William Ernst, Dr. Jennifer Russ and Lionel Stepter are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on April 11, 2016 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lefoldt v. Rentfro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Kenneth Lefoldt, Jr.
Represented By: Alysson Leigh Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Rentfro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Heburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeRoy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Serafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Godley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionel Stepter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horne, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?