Aries Building Systems, LLC v. Pike County Board of Supervisors et al
Plaintiff: Aries Building Systems, LLC
Defendant: Pike County Board of Supervisors and City of McComb, Mississippi
Case Number: 5:2016cv00016
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 62 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 17, 2017 (jr)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying City of McComb's Motion to Dismiss 31 and for Summary Judgment 32 ; denying Pike County's Motion to Dismiss 35 and for Summary Judgment 36 ; finding as moot Aries's Waiver and Withdrawal of Request for Jury Trial 30 , insofar as it may be construed as a motion to withdraw the plaintiff's jury demand. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 3/7/2017 (EB)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 10 Motion to Stay Proceedings Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 10/28/2016 (EB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aries Building Systems, LLC v. Pike County Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aries Building Systems, LLC
Represented By: Kyle L. Dickson - PHV
Represented By: Jerry L. Mills
Represented By: John P. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of McComb, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?