Beasley v. Lang et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Beasley
Defendant: Robert Lang, Beverly Lang, Eduardo A. Flechas, EF Properties, LLC and X, Y and Z Defendants
Case Number: 5:2016cv00082
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 97 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 4, 2018. (jg)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying 88 Motion to Dismiss; Cautioning EF Properties, LLC against continuing to file meritless motions, which have no apparent purpose other than to prolong this litigation.Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on May 14, 2018. (JBR)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 91 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2018. (jg)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 2, 2018. (jg)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 7/31/2017 (EB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Lang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Beasley
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo A. Flechas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EF Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X, Y and Z Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?