Chambliss et al v. Lincoln Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Chambliss, Malinda L. Chambliss, Oliver J. Chambliss, Jr., Garrvin Vondell Barnes, Jr., Koch Rashun Liggans and Octave Chambliss
Defendant: Lincoln Motor Company, Ford Motor Company and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 5:2016cv00125
Filed: December 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Claiborne
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Filing 18 Remark: Certified Copy of Remand Order mailed to Claiborne County Circuit Court. (MGB)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Remand Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 6/9/17 (MGB)
June 2, 2017 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Malinda Chambliss by Garrvin Vondell Barnes, Jr, Malinda L. Chambliss, Octave Chambliss, Oliver J. Chambliss, Jr, Koch Rashun Liggans (Shannon, James)
June 2, 2017 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Oliver Chambliss by Garrvin Vondell Barnes, Jr, Malinda L. Chambliss, Octave Chambliss, Oliver J. Chambliss, Jr, Koch Rashun Liggans (Shannon, James)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is hereby ordered that the plaintiffs have seven (7) days from the date of entry of this Order to file a revised affidavit limiting their recovery to $75,000, exclusive of interest and costs. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 5/26/2017 (EB)
May 22, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Gordon Sproule, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Sproule, R.)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #5 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 4/25/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiffs have ten (10) days from the entry of this Order to file an affidavit limiting their recovery to $75,000, exclusive interest and costs. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand shall be held in abeyance pending the submission of the aforementioned affidavit. (EB)
February 3, 2017 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter)(Gunn, George)
February 2, 2017 Filing 10 AGREED ORDER granting ore tenus motion for extension of time to file response. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on January 30, 2017. (lda)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONSOLIDATING Civil Action no. 5:16cv 125 and 5:16cv126. These matters are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including trial. All future pleadings and filings shall be filed only in Cause No. 5:16-cv-125-DCB-MTP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 1/24/17 (PKM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 24, 2017 (KPM)
January 20, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam D. Porter on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Porter, Adam)
January 13, 2017 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Garrvin Vondell Barnes, Jr, Malinda L. Chambliss, Octave Chambliss, Oliver J. Chambliss, Jr, Koch Rashun Liggans (White, Kathryn)
January 13, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support by Garrvin Vondell Barnes, Jr, Malinda L. Chambliss, Octave Chambliss, Oliver J. Chambliss, Jr, Koch Rashun Liggans (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(White, Kathryn)
January 13, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (PKM)
December 28, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Consolidate filed in 5:16-cv-126)(Gunn, George)
December 22, 2016 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Gunn, George)
December 22, 2016 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company (Gunn, George)
December 15, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Claiborne County Circuit Court, case number 2016-86. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643042647) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Ford, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambliss et al v. Lincoln Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chambliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda L. Chambliss
Represented By: James D. Shannon
Represented By: Kathryn L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver J. Chambliss, Jr.
Represented By: James D. Shannon
Represented By: Kathryn L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrvin Vondell Barnes, Jr.
Represented By: James D. Shannon
Represented By: Kathryn L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koch Rashun Liggans
Represented By: James D. Shannon
Represented By: Kathryn L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octave Chambliss
Represented By: James D. Shannon
Represented By: Kathryn L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Represented By: R. Gordon Sproule, Jr.
Represented By: Adam D. Porter
Represented By: Bradley W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?