Ross et al v. Quality Homes of McComb, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Earl Ross and Maxcine Ross
Defendant: Quality Homes of McComb, Inc., Miss Lou Mobile Home Movers, LLC, Platinum Homes, LLC, Joey Harbin and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00046
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on July 26, 2018 (JBR)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 51 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on May 16, 2018. (JBR)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice as to Defendants Joey Harbin and U.S. Bank, N.A. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on January 11, 2018 (JBR)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part 9 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 27 Motion to Dismiss; and ORDERING Plaintiffs, within ten days from entry of this Order, to show cause to this Court why it should not dismiss Count I, Count II, Count III, Count IV, Count VI, and Count VII, to the extent it alleges claims under the MCPA, with prejudice.Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on November 16, 2017 (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross et al v. Quality Homes of McComb, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Ross
Represented By: Angela T. Miller
Represented By: Charles E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxcine Ross
Represented By: Angela T. Miller
Represented By: Charles E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Homes of McComb, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Lou Mobile Home Movers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Harbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?