Richland Equipment Company, Inc., a Mississippi Corporation v. Deere & Company, a Delaware Corporation
Plaintiff: Richland Equipment Company, Inc., a Mississippi Corporation
Defendant: Deere & Company, a Delaware Corporation
Case Number: 5:2017cv00088
Filed: July 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Wilkinson
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 35 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal; finding as moot 37 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/19/17. (cb)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond on or before August 14, 2017, to Motion to Compel Arbitration 10 . If Defendant wants to reply, it must do so on or before August 21, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/1/2017 (dtj)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO; denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/18/2017 (dtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richland Equipment Company, Inc., a Mississippi Corporation v. Deere & Company, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richland Equipment Company, Inc., a Mississippi Corporation
Represented By: Robert C. Latham
Represented By: G. Allen Walsh - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Frank M. Holbrook
Represented By: Luther T. Munford
Represented By: William Polk Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?