Anderson v. Management Training Corporation (M-T-C) et al
Plaintiff: Levonzel Anderson
Defendant: Jane Doe, Sean K. Smith, Pelicia Hall, Larry Lee, Deputy Warden Gabriel Walker, John Doe, Unknown Arrington, Management Training Corporation (M-T-C), Unknown Arbuthnot, Warden Jody Bradley, Tonya Toomey, Unknown Taplan, Unknown Gale, Investigator Unknown Turner and Dr. Unknown Dunn
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2018cv00091
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Western Office
County: Wilkinson
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to file amended #1 Complaint, by Levonzel Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Cover Letter, #8 Envelope)(KNS)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Order by Levonzel Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNS)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Levonzel Anderson shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than October 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 09/25/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 , #6 , #7 , #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 09/20/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link] (CS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Levonzel Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by Levonzel Anderson (Attachments: #1 Appendix Envelope and a Letter from Uncle Yacky, #2 Appendix Using the GTL Phone System, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(LAT) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/19/2018) (LAT).
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Levonzel Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Levonzel Anderson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(LAT) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/7/2018) (LAT).
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Levonzel Anderson. (LAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2018: #1 Envelope) (LAT). (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/7/2018) (LAT).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/21/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/21/2018. (CS)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Levonzel Anderson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Arbuthnot, Unknown Arrington, Jody Bradley, Unknown Dunn, Unknown Gale, Pelicia Hall, Larry Lee, Management Training Corporation (M-T-C), Sean K. Smith, Unknown Taplan, Tonya Toomey, Unknown Turner, Gabriel Walker, filed by Levonzel Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope, #4 Notice of Assignment)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Management Training Corporation (M-T-C) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Gabriel Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management Training Corporation (M-T-C)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Arbuthnot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jody Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Taplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Unknown Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levonzel Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?