Anderson v. McClendon
Plaintiff: Cassie B. Anderson
Defendant: Page McClendon
Case Number: 5:2018cv00118
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
2 Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2019 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 1/9/19. (KPM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald I. Loeb on behalf of Page McClendon (Loeb, Ronald)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Honorable David C. Bramlette, III recused and Case reassigned to District Judge Keith Starrett for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/7/2018 (ND)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frey on behalf of Page McClendon (Frey, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendant Page McClendon Volumes 1 (Smith, Caroline)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Page McClendon.(Smith, Caroline)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Page McClendon from Chancery Court of Amite County, Mississippi, case number 18-178. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3850157) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing a Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Lower Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Page McClendon
Represented By: Caroline B. Smith
Represented By: Robert M. Frey
Represented By: Ronald I. Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie B. Anderson
Represented By: Mary Clay W. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?