United States of America v. Walker
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mary Walker
Case Number: 5:2019cv00018
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown and without objection, Defendant's Motion #6 is granted. Mary Walker answer due 4/29/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 22, 2019. (MMc)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mary Walker (Carter, Ottowa)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due on or before 4/19/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 27, 2019. (js)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Mary Walker (Carter, Ottowa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ottowa E. Carter, Jr on behalf of Mary Walker (Carter, Ottowa)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mary Walker served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (ND)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mary Walker. (ND)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Walker, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Indebtedness, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Walker
Represented By: Ottowa E. Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?