Home Bank, N.A. v. George Tarver Operating Co., LLC et al

Plaintiff: Home Bank, N.A.
Defendant: George Tarver Operating Co., LLC and John D. Tarver
Case Number: 5:2019cv00028
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Home Bank, N.A. against George Tarver Operating Co., LLC, and John D. Tarver. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 07/10/19 (KNS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of Affidavit in Support of Attorneys' Fees by Home Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Attorneys' Fees)(Spencer, Jimmy)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Default Judgment and requiring that Plaintiff Home Bank, N.A., submit to the Court a proposed Final Judgment within ten (10) days from entry of this ORDER. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 7/3/2019 (DW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to George Tarver Operating Co., LLC and John D. Tarver by Home Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ralph Edwards)(Spencer, Jimmy)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT against defendants George Tarver Operating Co., LLC and John D. Tarver (ASJ)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by Home Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jim F. Spencer, Jr.)(Spencer, Jimmy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Home Bank, N.A.. John D. Tarver served on 5/4/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Spencer, Jimmy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Home Bank, N.A.. George Tarver Operating Co., LLC served on 5/4/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Spencer, Jimmy)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to George Tarver Operating Co., LLC and John D. Tarver. (ND)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Home Bancorp, Inc. for Home Bank, N.A.. (Spencer, Jimmy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Tarver Operating Co., LLC and John D. Tarver ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3962583), filed by Home Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note 1 Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Note 1 Commercial Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C - Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D- Note 2 Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit E - Note 2 Commercial Guaranty, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Bank, N.A. v. George Tarver Operating Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Tarver Operating Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jimmy Fred Spencer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?