Green Riverside Inc v. Black Jack Oil Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Green Riverside Inc
Defendant: Black Jack Oil Company Inc, Kevin L Wilson and M L Vines Jr
Case Number: 5:2019cv00029
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 41 PHV Request Letter(s) sent to attorneys C. Magee, L. Ward, and W. Xu requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee in our Transfer Case Number 5:19cv29-DCB-MTP. Original letters mailed by K. Alexander.(VM)
April 12, 2019 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00396. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants Motion to Dismiss 12 and Motion to Dismiss 13 to the extent that the court lacks personal jurisdiction over both Defendants. The court, in the interest of justice, however, rather than dismiss the action, transfers it to the Southern District of Mississippi, Western Division. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/11/2019) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Black Jack Oil Company Inc, Kevin L Wilson filed by Green Riverside Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The court directs the clerk of court to file Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to its #32 Motion for New Trial to Provide for Amend[ed] Petition [sic]. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/10/2019) (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Memorandum Opinion and Order Grants #32 Motion for New Trial filed by Green Riverside Inc. Plaintiff shall file its Second Amended Complaint by January 7, 2019. The court directs the clerk of court to reopen this action and reinstate Defendant Black Jack Oil Company Inc.'s First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. #12 ) and Defendant Kevin L. Wilsons First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. #13 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/2/2019) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #34 Motion for Hearing on Motion for New Trial, as the court normally decides motions based upon the briefs and filings submitted by the parties, and, if, after reviewing the parties' briefs, the court determines that a hearing is necessary to clarify any issues of concern, it will sua sponte set a hearing and notify the parties. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 8/29/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Hearing on MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL filed by Green Riverside Inc (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 33 OBJECTION filed by Black Jack Oil Company Inc, Kevin L Wilson re: #32 MOTION for New Trial TO PROVIDE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT (Magee, Curt) Modified filer on 4/11/2018 (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for New Trial TO PROVIDE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Green Riverside Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Second Amended Complaint) (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum Opinion and Order : For the reasons herein set forth, Green Riverside has not shown that complete diversity of citizenship exists between the parties. Accordingly, the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction to hear this action and dismisses without prejudice this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Further, the lack of subject matter jurisdiction moots the following motions: Defendant Black Jack Oil Company, Inc.'s Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) (Doc. #12 ); Defendant Kevin L. Wilson's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) (Doc. #13 ); and Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 56.7 for Leave for Plaintiff to File Sur Response to Defendants' Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #23 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/14/2018) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT : In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and 26(f), counsel and any unrepresented party are directed to confer to (1) consider the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities of prompt settlement or resolution of the case; (2) make or arrange for the initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; (3) discuss any issues about preserving discoverable information; and (4) develop a proposed discovery plan that indicates the parties views and proposals on the matters set forth in Rule 26(f)(3). This conference shall take place no later than March 26, 2018. Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/9/2018) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Green Riverside Inc. (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: In light of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to M.L. Vines, Jr. (Doc. #27 ), filed 10/3/2017, the court denies as moot Defendant M. L. Vines['s] Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12 (b)(2) (Doc. #14 ), filed 5/23/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/4/2017) (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 27 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice as to M.L. Vines, Jr. by Green Riverside Inc. (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Kevin L Wilson re: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Response to Defendants' Reply Brief (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by M L Vines Jr re: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Response to Defendants' Reply Brief (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Black Jack Oil Company Inc re: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Response to Defendants' Reply Brief (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Response to Defendants' Reply Brief filed by Green Riverside Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Black Jack Oil Company Inc re: #12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Supplemental Affidavit Wilson) (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Kevin L Wilson re: #12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Affidavit in Support Wilson) (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by M L Vines Jr re: #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Supplemental Affidavit, #2 Affidavit(s) Affidavit in Support Wilson, #3 Affidavit(s) Affidavit in Support Hewitt) (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 19 Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in #18 Appendix in Support filed by Green Riverside Inc. (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 18 Appendix in Support filed by Green Riverside Inc re #15 Reply, #17 Reply, #16 Reply (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Green Riverside Inc re: #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 16 REPLY filed by Green Riverside Inc re: #13 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 15 REPLY filed by Green Riverside Inc re: #12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by M L Vines Jr (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Vines, #2 Additional Page(s) Service)Attorney Curt Magee, Sr added to party M L Vines Jr(pty:dft) (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kevin L Wilson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Additional Page(s))Attorney Curt Magee, Sr added to party Kevin L Wilson(pty:dft) (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Black Jack Oil Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service)Attorney Curt Magee, Sr added to party Black Jack Oil Company Inc(pty:dft) (Magee, Curt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed to Black Jack Oil Company Inc; served 5/8/2017. (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kevin Wilson ; served on 5/8/2017. (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to M L Vines Jr ; served on 5/10/2017. (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Black Jack Oil Company Inc, M L Vines Jr, Kevin L Wilson. (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
May 2, 2017 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Citations filed by Green Riverside Inc. (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Green Riverside Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint and set forth the basis for the courts jurisdiction. The Amended Complaint shall be filed by 3/16/2017. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended pleading as ordered, the court will dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/23/2017) (ran) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Green Riverside Inc. (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
February 13, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Black Jack Oil Company Inc, M L Vines Jr, Kevin L Wilson. (aaa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Black Jack Oil Company, Inc., M L Vines, Kevin L Wilson filed by Green Riverside, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8201841) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ward, Lloyd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Riverside Inc v. Black Jack Oil Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Jack Oil Company Inc
Represented By: Curt Magee, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin L Wilson
Represented By: Curt Magee, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M L Vines Jr
Represented By: Curt Magee, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Riverside Inc
Represented By: Lloyd Ward
Represented By: Wei Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?