Sayadi-Takhtehkar v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Hamid Reza Sayadi-Takhtehkar
Defendant: United States of America
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00043
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Hamid Reza Sayadi-Takhtehkar to FCI LA TUNA, P. O. Box 3000, Anthony, TX 88021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
June 5, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34643055112 (KNS) (NEF mailed to Plaintiff)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, on or before June 17, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 5/17/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Hamid Reza Sayadi-Takhtehkar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copy of NEF and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayadi-Takhtehkar v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamid Reza Sayadi-Takhtehkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?