Williams v. Turtle Creek Assets, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Lamarcus Williams
Defendant: Turtle Creek Assets, LTD. and Gordon Engle
Case Number: 5:2019cv00054
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lamarcus Williams (Hormozdi, Shireen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Lamarcus Williams (Hormozdi, Shireen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Withdrawing the Notice of Settlement by Lamarcus Williams re #4 Notice of Settlement (Hormozdi, Shireen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by Lamarcus Williams (Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lamarcus Williams. Turtle Creek Assets, LTD. waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lamarcus Williams. Gordon Engle waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Gordon Engle and Turtle Creek Assets, LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt number 0538-4008250 ) filed by Lamarcus Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Secr. of State Search Results, #2 Exhibit B - Taxable Entity Search, #3 Exhibit C - Turtle Creek's Forward Properties website ad, #4 Exhibit D - Turtle Creek's Forward Properties website ad / links, #5 Exhibit E - Collection Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Letter from D. Engle on 2/4/2019, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Turtle Creek Assets, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamarcus Williams
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Creek Assets, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?