The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Killingsworth et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Pruco Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Amy Fredette, I. M. K. and Leigh Ann Killingsworth
Case Number: 5:2019cv00055
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/20/19.(KPM)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brennan Patrick Breeland terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on August 5, 2019. (js)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Allen on behalf of Leigh Ann Killingsworth (Allen, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Leigh Ann Killingsworth (Breeland, Brennan)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Amy Ferdette's is granted 20 additional days to respond to the Complaint and the cross claim filed by Leigh Ann Killingsworth. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 31, 2019. (js)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant I.M.K. is granted 15 additional days to respond the Complaint and the cross claim filed by Leigh Ann Killingsworth. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 31, 2019. (js)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #6 Crossclaim, #8 Crossclaim (attachment) by Amy Fredette (Fernald, Joseph) Modified on 7/30/2019 (PKM).
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, #6 Crossclaim, #8 Crossclaim (attachment) by I. M. K. (Kellems, W.) Modified on 7/30/2019 (PKM).
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Brady Kellems on behalf of I. M. K. (Kellems, W.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's Response to counterclaims due by 8/29/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 24, 2019. (js)
July 23, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 : Clerk's office has modified entry to show a relationship to Counterclaim, document #6 . (PKM)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Defendant Leigh Ann Killingsworth's Counterclaims, document #6 , by Pruco Life Insurance Company (Quinlivan, Lawrence) Modified on 7/23/2019 (PKM).
July 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : Clerk's office has modified entry to show that Amended Complaint is against defendants Leigh Ann Killingsworth, Amy Fredette, I.M.K. (PKM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pruco Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Prudential Insurance Company of America for Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Leigh Ann Killingsworth, Amy Fredette, I.M.K., filed by Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Specimen Copy of the Policy A, #2 Exhibit B - Application of Life Insurance or Policy Change form dated November 30, 2008, #3 Exhibit C - Specimen Copy of the Policy B, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of the Application of Life Insurance dated May 21, 2012, #5 Exhibit E - Copy of the Decree of Divorce and Property Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Copy of the Request to Change Beneficiary on Life Insurance Policies form, #7 Exhibit G - Copy of the Request to Change Beneficiary on Life Insurance Policies, #8 Exhibit H - Fax Communication and Request to change beneficiary on life insurance policy, #9 Exhibit I - copy of the letter dated April 28, 2017, #10 Exhibit J - Copy of the letter dated October 3, 2018, #11 Exhibit K - Copy of the October 2018 Letter, #12 Exhibit L - A copy of the Request to Change Beneficiary on Life Insurance Policies form dated October 9, 2018, #13 Exhibit M - A copy of the Request to Change Beneficiary on Life Insurance Policies form dated October 9, 2018, #14 Exhibit N - A copy of the Insured's Certification of Death, #15 Exhibit O - A copy of the Life Insurance Claim form dated January 4, 2019, #16 Exhibit P - A copy of the Life Insurance Claim form dated January 4, 2019, #17 Exhibit Q - A copy of the Life Insurance Claim form dated January 14, 2019, #18 Exhibit R - A copy of the January 24, 2019 letter)(Quinlivan, Lawrence) Modified on 7/15/2019 (PKM).
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. I. M. K. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT re #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Leigh Ann Killingsworth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter January 29, 2019, #2 Exhibit B-Letter February 14, 2019, #3 Exhibit C-Letter April 12, 2019, #4 Exhibit D-Letter April 25, 2019, #5 Exhibit E-Letter May 28, 2019, #6 Exhibit F-Complaint for Discovery)(Breeland, Brennan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Amy Fredette served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Amy Fredette, COUNTERCLAIM against The Prudential Insurance Company of America by Leigh Ann Killingsworth.(Breeland, Brennan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Leigh Ann Killingsworth served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Durwood J. Breeland on behalf of Leigh Ann Killingsworth(Breeland, Durwood)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amy Fredette, I. M. K., Leigh Ann Killingsworth. (MGB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against Amy Fredette, I. M. K., Leigh Ann Killingsworth ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4010149), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Specimen Copy of the Policy A, #2 Exhibit B - Application for Life Insurance or Policy Change form dated 11-30-08, #3 Exhibit C - Specimen Copy of the Policy B, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of Application for Life Insurance dated 5-21-12, #5 Exhibit E - Copy of the Decree of Divorce and Property Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Copy of the Request to Change Beneficiary on Life Insurance Policies, #7 Exhibit G - Copy of the Request to Change Beneficiary on Life Insurance Policies, #8 Exhibit H - Faxed communication and request to change beneficiary on Life Insurance, #9 Exhibit I - Copy of the letter dated April 28, 2017, #10 Exhibit J - Copy of the letter dated October 3, 2018, #11 Exhibit K - Copy of the October 2018 Letter, #12 Exhibit L - Request to change beneficiary on Life Insurance Polices form dated O, #13 Exhibit M - Request to change beneficiary on Life Insurance Policies form dated, #14 Exhibit N - Insured's Certification of Death, #15 Exhibit O - Life Insurance Claim Form dated January 4, 2019, #16 Exhibit P - Life Insurance Claim Form dated January 4, 2019, #17 Exhibit Q - Life Insurance Claim Form dated January 14, 2019, #18 Exhibit R - Copy of the January 24, 2019 Letter, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) Modified on 6/13/2019 (LAT). Modified on 6/13/2019 (PKM). Modified on 6/13/2019 (PKM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Killingsworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Fredette
Represented By: Joseph A. Fernald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. M. K.
Represented By: W. Brady Kellems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Ann Killingsworth
Represented By: Durwood J. Breeland
Represented By: Robert O. Allen
Represented By: Brennan Patrick Breeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Lawrence M. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence M. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?