Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Casablanca Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Defendant: the Estate of Thomas W. Saucier, Deceased, Casablanca Construction, Inc. and Evelyne B. Saucier
Case Number: 5:2019cv00062
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Remand for Lack of Subjet Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Remand filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Taylor, Alec)
August 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : This document requests two motion reliefs. Each motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (KNS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Remand for Lack of Subjet Matter Jurisdiction by The Estate of Thomas W Saucier, Deceased Casablanca Construction, Inc., Evelyne B. Saucier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Claim)(Blair, Robin) Modified on 8/13/2019 (KNS). Added MOTION to Remand on 8/16/2019 (KNS).
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Evelyne B. Saucier served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Taylor, Alec)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. the Estate of Thomas W. Saucier, Deceased served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Taylor, Alec)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Casablanca Construction, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Taylor, Alec)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Casablanca Construction, Inc., Evelyne B. Saucier and the Estate of Thomas W. Saucier, Deceased. (ND)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY against Casablanca Construction, Inc., Evelyne B. Saucier, the Estate of Thomas W. Saucier, Deceased ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4034051), filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement of Indemnity, #2 Exhibit 2 - Performance Bond, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter of July 23, 2018, #4 Exhibit 4 - Tender Agreement and Release, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Casablanca Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the Estate of Thomas W. Saucier, Deceased
Represented By: Robin Blackledge Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casablanca Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Blackledge Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyne B. Saucier
Represented By: Robin Blackledge Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Alec M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?