JOHNSON v. STATE OF MISSISSIPPI et al
Plaintiff: BRANDON JOHNSON
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI and WCCF SECURITY STAFF
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00078
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01510. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Mississippi. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/23/2019. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by BRANDON JOHNSON (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/11/2019. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, WCCF SECURITY STAFF filed by BRANDON JOHNSON.(zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/22/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. STATE OF MISSISSIPPI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCCF SECURITY STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?