Gonzalez v. Kolitwenzew et al
Petitioner: Luis H Gonzalez and Carlos Ramos Sanchez
Respondent: Ron Vitiello, Jose L. Zamora, Chad Kolitwenzew, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Interested Party: Edward O. Pearson United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00108
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 33 Letter sent to Nancy Ann Nicholson, Esq. on 10/18/2019 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PG)
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-02192. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/17/19. Government's Motions to Transfer #25 #30 and Petitioner's Motion to Transfer #28 are GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this case to the District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a). Additionally, Petitioner's Motion to Reopen Case #28 is DENIED AS MOOT as this case was never closed. Petitioner's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis #29 is also DENIED AS MOOT, as Petitioner has already been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will leave Petitioner's remaining Motion to file a traverse #28 for determination by the transferee court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update Petitioner's mailing address to the one provided in his most recent filing and send a copy of this order to Petitioner's updated address: Carlos Ramos Sanchez, A209413252, Adams County Correctional Center, P.O. Box 1600, Washington, MS 39190. See written Order. (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Transfer Case and Response to Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Interested Party United States of America. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (Frooman, Hilary) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Luis H Gonzalez. Responses due by 10/30/19. (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION TO REOPEN and FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE TRAVERSE INSTANTER AND TO CHANE VENUE by Petitioner Luis H Gonzalez. Responses due by 10/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Traverse, #2 Envelope) (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address by Luis H Gonzalez (contained in Petition to Proceed in forma Pauperis) from Pulaski County Detention Center to Adams County Detention Center, A209413252, PO Box 1600, Washington, MS 39190. (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re Mail sent to Luis Gonzalez addressed at Pulaski County Detention Center (9/26/19 Text Order). (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Frooman, Hilary) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 24 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re #22 . Mail sent to Luis Gonzalez at Jerome Combs. (Remailed to him at Pulaski County Detention Center, 20 Justice Drive, Ullin, IL 62992.) (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/26/19. The Government filed a Motion to Dismiss #21 on September 10, 2019, indicating that the Petitioner had already been removed from the United States on August 23, 2019. However, nearly a month later, the ICE detainee locator (htts://locator.ice.gov) indicates that Petitioner is still in immigration detention, but has been moved to the Pulaski County Jail, in Ullin, Illinois. Accordingly, the Government's Motion #21 is DENIED. The Government is ORDERED to submit an update with the Court as to the Petitioner's location and its plans for his removal on or before October 1, 2019. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to update Petitioner's address to: Pulaski County Detention Center, 20 Justice Drive, Ullin, Illinois 62992. (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re Text Order dated 8/30/2019. Mail sent to Luis Gonzalez (JMB, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered re #21 MOTION to Dismiss. (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Interested Party United States of America. Responses due by 9/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Frooman, Hilary) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Effective 9/1/2019 this case is reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce for further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/30/19. (DK, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE by Kankakee County State's Attorney acknowledging receipt of #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #14 .(VH, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Interested Party United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Declaration)(Frooman, Hilary) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Chad Kolitwenzew. (Nicholson, Nancy) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nancy Ann Nicholson on behalf of Chad Kolitwenzew (Nicholson, Nancy) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/29/2019. The United States' Motion to Substitute Attorney #15 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to substitute Hilary W. Frooman for Greggory R. Walters as the attorney for the United States in this matter. (VH, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Greggory R. Walters to be replaced by Hilary W. Frooman, by Interested Party United States of America. Responses due by 8/12/2019 (Frooman, Hilary) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE by US Attorney acknowledging receipt of #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #14 Order. (VH, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/23/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: (1) Chad Kolitwenzew is named Respondent in this case. The Clerk of the Court shall serve Respondent and his statutorily-mandated attorney, Kankakee County State's Attorney Jim Rowe, by certified mail pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(b), with a copy of the Petition and this Order. Respondent is ORDERED to respond within fourteen (14) days to the Petition. Respondent shall include in his response a response to Petitioner's claims that the Jerome Combs Detention Center will not allow him to pay the filing fee from his institutional account, as detailed above. (2)The United States is named Interested Party in this case. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the United States with a copy of the Petition and this Order. The United States is ORDERED to respond within fourteen (14) days to the Petition. (3) Respondent and the United States are DIRECTED to attach those portions of the administrative record that are relevant to Petitioner's claims. (4) Petitioner is ORDERED to file any traverse or reply to the response within fourteen (14) days after service of said response on him. (5) Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent and the United States, or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon his attorney, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Petitioner shall include with the original paper to be filed with the Clerk of the Court a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of any document was mailed to Respondent or his counsel. Any paper received by this Court which has not been filed with the Clerk or which fails to include a certificate of service will be disregarded by the Court. (6) Petitioner must immediately notify the Court of any change in his mailing address. Failure to notify the Court of any change in mailing address will result in dismissal of this matter, with prejudice. (7) William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Ron Vitiello, and Jose L. Zamora are TERMINATED from this Case. (8) Petitioner's Motions for Appointment of Counsel (Docs. 3 and 9) are DENIED without prejudice. See full written Order.(VH, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03221. . [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois the electronic record.(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 ENTERED JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Order, this case is transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Urbana, Illinois, for preliminary consideration. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the notice of motion for Docket Entry 3 in CM/ECF and close this case number on this Court's docket.Mailed notice(slb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Petitioner Carlos Ramos Sanchez for attorney representation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (Envelope not postmarked) (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus under U.S.C. 2241 filed by Carlos Ramos Sanchez against William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Ron Vitiello, Jose L. Zamora. (Envelope not postmarked) (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Carlos Ramos Sanchez dated 5/28/2019 (Envelope postmarked 5/30/2019). (las, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Carlos Ramos Shanchez dated 5/18/19. (Envelope postmarked 5/22/19)(ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Acknowledgment Letter regarding new case information to Carlos Ramos Sanchez. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Luis H. Gonzalez in support of request to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Petitioner Luis H. Gonzalez for attorney representation. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Luis H. Gonzalez; (Exhibits). (Envelope not postmarked). (smm, ) Modified on 7/22/2019 to change to Petition (VH, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Kolitwenzew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis H Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Ramos Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Vitiello
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jose L. Zamora
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Kolitwenzew
Represented By: Nancy Ann Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Edward O. Pearson United States of America
Represented By: Hilary W. Frooman-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?