Alvarez v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Josep Ramirez Alvarez
Defendant: Matthew Albence, U. S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, SHAWN GILLIS, Kevin McAleenan, Phillip Miller, William Barr and United State Department of Homeland Security
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00123
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, on or before February 5, 2020, Petitioner is directed to file a response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 1/13/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Change of Address filed by Josep Ramirez Alvarez Josep, 3129 Montana Way,Marietta, GA 30066. (cwl)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 REMARK: Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury by plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cwl)
December 12, 2019 Copy of Order #2 , Petition and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury mailed to petitioner. (LDR)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, the Clerk directed to edit Petitioners address to include his alien number as A#205-130-421. Petitioner on or before January 10, 2020, must file his signed Petition as directed in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 12/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury)(LDR) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/12/2019) (LDR).
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643057284.), filed by Josep Ramirez Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Attachment Supplement to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN GILLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josep Ramirez Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?