Patel v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Vasudev Patel
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Diane Witte, William Barr and Shawn Gillis
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00054
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Bhavya Chaudhary is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 1, 2020 (KPM)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Bhavya Chaudhary to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264592) by Vasudev Patel (Riches, Brandon)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel by Vasudev Patel (Riches, Brandon)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Response in Opposition re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643058641.), filed by Vasudev Patel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEF, Receipt and Notice of Assignment mailed to Petitioner) filed by Shawn Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Patrick McCallion, #2 Exhibit B - Form I-229a)(Nobile-Federal Gov, Emily)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Mail sent to Petitioner. NEF for TOO re-mailed to Petitioner at Adams County Correctional center, 20 Hobo Fork Road, Natchez, MS 39120. (KNS)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope) (KNS)
April 13, 2020 Remark: copy of TOO of 04/13/2020 mailed to Petitioner. (KNS)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shawn Gillis answer due 4/27/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 13, 2020 (KPM)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Shawn Gillis (Nobile-Federal Gov, Emily)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Attorney General of the U.S. DOJ, as to Shawn Gillis served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. (KNS)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis on 03/23/2020. (KNS)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Civil Process Clerk, Office of the U.S. Attorney, as to Shawn Gillis served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (KNS)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Shawn Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center, is the proper Respondent and any others listed on the docket are hereby removed as Respondents. Respondent Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/19/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643058641.), filed by Vasudev Patel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEF, Receipt and Notice of Assignment mailed to Petitioner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vasudev Patel
Represented By: Bhavya Chaudhary - PHV
Represented By: Brandon H. Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Gillis
Represented By: Emily S. Nobile-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?