Singh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Ravinder Singh
Respondent: W.B. Barr, U.S. ICE Field Office Director, Shawn R. Gillis and Secretary of DHS
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00055
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 Change of Address to Prairieland Detention Center, 1209 Sunflower Lane, Alvarado Texas 76009 filed by Ravinder Singh (Copy of Docket Sheet and Documents returned re-mailed to new address) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MGB)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn R. Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Patrick McCallion Declaration)(Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mail sent to Ravinder Singh (MGB)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shawn R. Gillis answer due 4/29/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 15, 2020 (KPM)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn R. Gillis (Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Case-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn R. Gillis (Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #2 Order,. Mail sent to Ravinder Singh (MGB)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed (Attorney General of the United States) (MGB)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis (Civil Process Clerk)served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (MGB)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (MGB)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, W.B. Barr, the Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Field Office Director are removed as Respondents. Respondent Warden Shawn R. Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 3/25/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058658.), filed by Ravinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEF and notice of assignment mailed to Petitioner.)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W.B. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ICE Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Jennifer Case-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ravinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?