Valbuena v. Gillis
Plaintiff: Jesus Alexander Gil Valbuena
Defendant: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00061
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 Change of Address filed by Jesus Alexander Gil Valbuena: 7234 Tara Boulevar APTO F-S, Jonesboro-Georgia-Atlanta. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Mootness by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Officer Tham, #2 Exhibit B Order of Supervision)(Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis (Attorney General) served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (LAT)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn R. Gillis (Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis(Civil Process Clerk) served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (LAT)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis (Warden) served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (LAT)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Respondent Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/25/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058737.), filed by Jesus Alexander Gil Valbuena. (Attachments: #1 Immigration and Customs Enforcement Documents, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(Copy of Notice of Assignment mailed to plaintiff)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valbuena v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Alexander Gil Valbuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?