Roger v. Barr
Defendant: Shawn Gillis
Petitioner: Herrera Urdaneta Roger
Respondent: William Barr
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00062
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Shawn Gillis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Herrera Urdaneta Roger. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 5, 2020. (MMc)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness by Shawn Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Deportation Officer Shane Musgrave, #2 Exhibit B - Order of Supervision)(Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #2 Order sent to Herrera Urdaneta Roger. (ND)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by as to Attorney General of U.S. served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (ND)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Civil Process Clerk. (ND)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden, Adams Co. Correctional served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (ND)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Shawn Gillis replaces Attorney General William Barr on the docket. Respondent Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 03/26/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058742.), filed by Herrera Urdaneta Roger. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEF and notice of assignment mailed to Petitioner.)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roger v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herrera Urdaneta Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Gillis
Represented By: Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?