Mayank v. Gillis
Petitioner: MaYank MaYank
Respondent: W.B. Barr, ICE Field Office Director, Shawn R. Gillis and Secretary of DHS
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00071
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #12 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 7, 2020. (js)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Response in Opposition, , #11 Attachment by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Appear)(Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 ATTACHMENT of Exhibit 1 re #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Response in Opposition, by Shawn R. Gillis (Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Response in Opposition, by Shawn R. Gillis (Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Change of Address filed by MaYank MaYank: LaSalle Correction, Prairieland Detention Center, 1209 Sunflower Lane, Alvardo, Texas 760093. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 Response in Opposition re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058822.), filed by MaYank MaYank. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, # 2 Notice of Assignment)(NEF and notice of assignment mailed to Petitioner.)(LAT) filed by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Patrick McCallion)(Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis (Attorney General) served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (LAT) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/16/2020) (LAT).
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn R. Gillis (Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #2 Order, Add and Terminate Parties. Mail sent to MaYank MaYank. (LAT)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Civil Process Clerk as to Office of U.S. Attorney served on 4/6/2020 answer due 4/27/2020. (PG)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (PG)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, the proper Respondent is Shawn Gillis and the additional Respondents listed on the docket are hereby removed as a Respondent. Clerk shall correct the short title of this case to "Mayank v. Gillis." Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 04/03/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643058822.), filed by MaYank MaYank. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEF and notice of assignment mailed to Petitioner.)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayank v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W.B. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MaYank MaYank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?