Singh v. Gillis et al
Petitioner: Manpreet Singh
Respondent: Stanley Crockett, Shawn Gillis, William P. Barr and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00096
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Release from Detention or Bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 4, 2020. (MMc)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Order #16 . Respondent's supplemental briefing due on or before 6/8/2020. Petitioner's reply due on or 6/15/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 28, 2020. (MMc)
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's Order [ECF No. 16] filed by Shawn Gillis (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
May 27, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's Order [ECF No. 16] Opposing Extension filed by Manpreet Singh (Tinsley, James)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER setting expedited briefing schedule re Motion #17 for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall respond to the Motion #17 on or before 5/28/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 27, 2020. (MMc)
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's Order [ECF No. 16] by Shawn Gillis (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing supplemental briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 19, 2020. (MMc)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion for Emergency release from Detention or bond filed by Manpreet Singh (Tinsley, James)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Response to Order re #9 ORDER directing Petitioner's counsel to show cause on or before 5/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc) filed by Manpreet Singh (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Tinsley, #2 Affidavit Attorney Grotas, #3 Supplement New Jersey Certificate)(Tinsley, James)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION Release from detention or Bond filed by Shawn Gillis (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Hagan Declaration, #2 Attachment 2 - Medical Form)(Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Paul B. Grotas is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 8, 2020 (KPM)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Paul B. Grotas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4270046) by Manpreet Singh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing New York, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing SD of New York)(Tinsley, James)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Case-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn Gillis (Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn Gillis (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Petitioner's counsel to show cause on or before 5/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting briefing schedule re Motion #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Respondent's RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Shawn Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy Zwetow, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting Stay, #3 Exhibit 3 - 5th Circuit Docket Sheet)(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION Release from detention or Bond by Manpreet Singh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Record, #2 Affidavit Paul Grotas, Esq., #3 Affidavit Sukpal Singh)(Tinsley, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis (Attorney General of United States) served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (PKM)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (PKM)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Shawn Gillis (Civil Process Clerk) as to Shawn Gillis served on 4/10/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (PKM)
April 7, 2020 Petitioner is represented by counsel; copy of Order was not mailed to petitioner. (LDR)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, the proper Respondent is Shawn Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center. Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. Chad Wolf, William P. Barr and Stanley Crockett terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 4/7/2020.[Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 paid; receipt number 34643059008 ), filed by Manpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Custody Order, #2 Exhibit 1B - Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Board's decision and Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - USCA Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - Bond Exhibits, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Gillis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stanley Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Gillis
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Represented By: Jennifer Case-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manpreet Singh
Represented By: James Paul Tinsley
Represented By: Paul B. Grotas - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?