Johnson et al v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Ivon Johnson and Ian Johnson
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00100
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Leave to File, #5 Response to Motion filed by Ivon Johnson (Woodberry, Dexter)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT re #5 Response to Motion Exhibit B by GEICO Indemnity Company (Waits, John)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Leave to File filed by GEICO Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Waits, John)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 17, 2020 (KPM)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ivon Johnson (Woodberry, Dexter). Added MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint on 4/17/2020 (ND).
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by GEICO Indemnity Company (Waits, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO Indemnity Company from Jefferson County, MS, case number 2020-48. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4247981) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B- Correspondence from Plaintiffs' Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivon Johnson
Represented By: Dexter L. Woodberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Johnson
Represented By: Dexter L. Woodberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: John A. Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?