Espinoza et al v. Witte et al
Petitioner: Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Anthony Baptiste, Linda Chuo Fru, Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo, Jose Ruben Lira Arias and Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza
Respondent: Dianne Witte, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew T. Albence and Shawn Gillis
Case Number: 5:2020cv00106
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Proceedings held on May 19, 2020 before Judge David C. Bramlette, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candice Crane, Telephone Number : 601-608-4187. NOTICE RE : REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no Notice is filed, the transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on the court website at www.mssd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2020. (CC)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 06/03/2020 (sl)
June 1, 2020 Filing 33 Response in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff) filed by Shawn Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Gillis Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2-CDC Guidance)(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ONLY: Petitioners have filed a Supplemental Authority in Support of their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [ECF No. 32]. The Government has five (5) days from the entry of this Text Order to respond. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on 05/26/2020 (sl)
May 22, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with supplemental authority filed by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit District Court order in Dada v. Witte, #2 Exhibit District Court order in Coreas v. Bounds)(Schwarz - PHV, Ghita)
May 19, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David C. Bramlette, III: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2020 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo, Anthony Baptiste. PARTICIPANTS: Ghita Schwarz, Cliff Johnson, Attorneys for the Plaintiffs; Angela Givens Williams, AUSA. The Court heard from the parties on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court will file a Memorandum Opinion and Order ruling on the Motion. The parties may submit additional facts on the Motion prior to the Court's ruling. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candice Crane, Telephone Number : 601-608-4187. (lda)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting pro hac admission of Angelo Guisado and Baher Azmy upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 18, 2020 (KPM)
May 15, 2020 Filing 31 ATTACHMENT re #17 MOTION for Baher Azmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264610), #23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,Certificate of Good Standing Dated May 13, 2020 by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
May 15, 2020 Filing 30 ATTACHMENT re #23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, #18 MOTION for Angelo Guisado to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264612) Certificate of Good Standing Dated May 12, 2020 by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting pro hac admission of Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre and Gita Schwarz upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 14, 2020 (KPM)
May 13, 2020 Set Hearing as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge David C. Bramlette III.) (lda)
May 13, 2020 Filing 29 ATTACHMENT re #23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, #16 MOTION for Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264608) Certificate of Good Standing dated May 12, 2020 by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
May 13, 2020 Filing 28 ATTACHMENT re #23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #20 MOTION for Ghita Schwarz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264615) Certificate of Good Standing dated May 12, 2020 by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
May 11, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shawn Gillis.(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
May 6, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Cliff Johnson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Johnson, Cliff)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting pro hac vice admission of Sirine Shebaya and Matthew S. Vogel upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 5, 2020 (KPM)
May 5, 2020 Filing 25 ATTACHMENT re #11 MOTION for Matthew S. Vogel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4262103), #22 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, Corrected Certificate of Good Standing by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
May 4, 2020 Filing 24 ATTACHMENT re #12 MOTION for Sirine Shebaya to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4262122) Corrected Certificate of Good Standing by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc)
April 30, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Brittany Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264617) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Ghita Schwarz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264615) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Astha Sharma Pokharel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264613) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Angelo Guisado to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264612) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Baher Azmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264610) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4264608) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Shawn Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Hagan Decl. I, #2 Exhibit 2-Hagan Decl. II, #3 Exhibit 3-Gillis Decl.)(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Jeremy Jong to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4262718) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn Gillis (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Sirine Shebaya to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4262122) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Matthew S. Vogel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4262103) by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling ORDER re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 and request for preliminary injunction. Response due 4/30/2020. Reply due 5/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 27, 2020. (MMc)
April 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2020. The parties discussed a briefing schedule. An order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Cliff Johnson for plaintiff; Angela Williams for respondent. (KPM)
April 27, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/27/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. (MMc)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis (Attorney General of the United States) served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. (PKM)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (PKM)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis (Civil Process Clerk)served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (PKM)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Dianne Witte, Matthew T. Albence, and Immigration and Customs Enforcement are hereby removed as Respondents. Respondent Warden Shawn Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case within 20 days of the service of a copy of this Order. Dianne Witte, Matthew T. Albence and Immigration and Customs Enforcement terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 4/20/2020. (LDR)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jose Ruben Lira Arias, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Anthony Baptiste, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Linda Chuo Fru, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Lydia Bazzano, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Jaimie Meyer, #10 Exhibit Orders & Opinions Releasing Individuals from Immigration Detention)(Johnson, Cliff)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Jose Ruben Lira Arias, Anthony Baptiste, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo (Johnson, Cliff)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shawn Gillis, Matthew T. Albence, Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Dianne Witte. (Attachments: #1 Summons Matthew T. Albence, #2 Summons ICE, #3 Summons Dianne Witte)(ND)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus and COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Matthew T. Albence, Shawn Gillis, Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Dianne Witte ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4254123) filed by Anthony Baptiste, Edilia Del Carmen Martinez, Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo, Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh, Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza, Linda Chuo Fru and Jose Ruben Lira Arias. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza et al v. Witte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edilia Del Carmen Martinez
Represented By: Cliff Johnson
Represented By: Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre - PHV
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya - PHV
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz - PHV
Represented By: Matthew S. Vogel - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Baptiste
Represented By: Cliff Johnson
Represented By: Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre - PHV
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya - PHV
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz - PHV
Represented By: Matthew S. Vogel - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Linda Chuo Fru
Represented By: Cliff Johnson
Represented By: Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre - PHV
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya - PHV
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz - PHV
Represented By: Matthew S. Vogel - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ndikum Keshia Angu Anjoh
Represented By: Cliff Johnson
Represented By: Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre - PHV
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya - PHV
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz - PHV
Represented By: Matthew S. Vogel - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Viankis Maria Yanes Pardillo
Represented By: Cliff Johnson
Represented By: Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre - PHV
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya - PHV
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz - PHV
Represented By: Matthew S. Vogel - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Ruben Lira Arias
Represented By: Cliff Johnson
Represented By: Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre - PHV
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya - PHV
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz - PHV
Represented By: Matthew S. Vogel - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leyanis Tamayo Espinoza
Represented By: Cliff Johnson
Represented By: Guadalupe Victoria Aguirre - PHV
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya - PHV
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz - PHV
Represented By: Matthew S. Vogel - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dianne Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Gillis
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?