Singh v. Gillis
Petitioner: Narinder Singh
Respondent: Attorney General W.B. Barr, U.S. ICE Field Office, Secretary of DHS and Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00118
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 Response in Opposition re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643059238.), filed by Narinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, # 2 Envelope)(PG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/29/2020) (PG). filed by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Ian Spino)(Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn R. Gillis (Bourne-Federal Gov, Jessica)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General of the United States, as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (PG)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Civil Process Clerk as to Office of U.S. Attorney served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020, (per U.S. Attorney's Office designee). (PG)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden Shawn R. Gillis served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (PG)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, the proper Respondent is Shawn R. Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center. Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. U.S. ICE Field Office, W.B. Barr and Secretary of DHS terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 5/6/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
April 29, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 attachment 1 Notice of Assignment, court staff has replaced with corrected pdf. (PG)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643059238.), filed by Narinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(PG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/29/2020) (PG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General W.B. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ICE Field Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Jessica N. Bourne-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Narinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?