Orellana Lluvicura v. Gillis
Petitioner: Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura
Respondent: Warden Shawn Gillis
Case Number: 5:2020cv00128
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 23 Rebuttal re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Respondent's Submission filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Prof. Lauren Brinkley-Rubinstein)(Fankbonner - PHV, Edgar)
June 7, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #22 : Clerk's office has created a relationship to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, document #1 . (PKM)
June 5, 2020 Filing 22 Rebuttal re #19 Response to Habeas Petition, document #1 , filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Prof. Lauren Brinkley-Rubinstein)(Fankbonner - PHV, Edgar) Modified on 6/7/2020 (PKM).
June 4, 2020 Filing 21 Sealed Document RE: #19 Response to Habeas Petition filed by Shawn Gillis (LAT)
June 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING filed by Shawn Gillis. (LAT)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Edgar L. Fankbonner is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 4, 2020 (KPM)
June 4, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Medical Records (to be filed under seal))(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal. Respondent may file the exhibit under seal and provide a copy to Petitioner and the Court. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 4, 2020. (MMc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SEALED Document by Shawn Gillis (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
June 2, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #16 and #17 : Clerk's office has modified entries to also show a relationship to document #1 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (PKM)
June 2, 2020 Filing 17 Rebuttal re #15 Response to Order, Jurisdiction re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura (Tinsley, James) Modified on 6/2/2020 (PKM).
May 30, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Supplemental Declaration filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit BIA Motion)(Tinsley, James) Modified on 6/2/2020 (PKM).
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 Response to Order re #11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Jurisdiction filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura (Tinsley, James) filed by Shawn Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-ICE Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2-Second Circuit Order)(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Previous Order of Supervision, #2 Exhibit FBI Rap sheet)(Tinsley, James)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden Shawn Gillis served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (PG)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General of the United States as to Shawn Gillis served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (PG)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Jurisdiction filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura (Tinsley, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov on behalf of Shawn Gillis (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Edgar L. Fankbonner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4278308) by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing SD of NY)(Tinsley, James)
May 19, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Keith Starrett: Telephone Conference held on 5/19/2020. Participating on behalf of the Plaintiff, James Tinsley and Edgar Fankbonner, and on behalf of the Government, Angela Williams. Court Reporter Fred Jeske, Telephone Number : 601-255-6432. (dtj)
May 19, 2020 Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/19/2020, 02:00 PM before District Judge Keith Starrett. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1828 and enter passcode 940-8529 to join the call. (dtj)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Civil Process Clerk, as to Shawn Gillis served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. (PG)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Respondent Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 5/12/2020. (LDR)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying #4 Motion for TRO. The Court denies Petitioner's Motion for a TRO #4 and Motion for an Order to Show Cause #2 . The Court defers consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #3 until Respondent has been served and provided an opportunity to respond. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/11/20. (cb)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(PG)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643059343.), filed by Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orellana Lluvicura v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis F. Orellana Lluvicura
Represented By: James Paul Tinsley
Represented By: Edgar L. Fankbonner - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Shawn Gillis
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?