Foster v. Gillis
Plaintiff: Sean Jonathan Foster
Defendant: Shawn R. Gillis
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00143
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness by Shawn R. Gillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jose Benavidez)(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Civil Process Clerk, as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (PG)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General of the United States, as to Shawn R. Gillis served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (PG)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #2 Order,. Mail sent to Sean Jonathan Foster (PG)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden Shawn R. Gillis served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (PG)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, Respondent Gillis shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 6/25/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643059775.), filed by Sean Jonathan Foster. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Jonathan Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn R. Gillis
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?