Rushing et al v. Foremost Insurance Group et al
Plaintiff: Monique Rushing and Lindell D. Rushing
Defendant: John Does and Foremost Insurance Group
Case Number: 5:2020cv00154
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Foremost Insurance Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SDT (Adams County Water Assn), #2 Exhibit 2 - SDT (AT&T), #3 Exhibit 3 - SDT (Concordia Bank), #4 Exhibit 4 - SDT (Fayette Public Works), #5 Exhibit 5 - SDT (Riverland Federal Credit Union), #6 Exhibit 6 - SDT (Southwest MS Power Assn))(Mansfield, Kenna)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Foremost Insurance Group (Mansfield, Kenna)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Foremost Insurance Group (Mansfield, Kenna)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/18/20. (KPM)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Foremost Insurance Group (Mansfield, Kenna)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foremost Insurance Group from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2020-68. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4323176) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing et al v. Foremost Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Rushing
Represented By: Jeffery K. Harness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindell D. Rushing
Represented By: Jeffery K. Harness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Group
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?