Brent v. MTC Management Training Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel T. Brent
Defendant: MTC Management Training Corp., WCCF Wilkinson County Correctional Facility and MDOC Mississippi Department of Corrections
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2020cv00173
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/14/2020. [Copy mailed to plaintiff and Premier Supply Link for MDOC] (LDR)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, re: #4 Order, by Nathaniel T. Brent. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Nathaniel T. Brent. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before September 28, 2020, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 9/28/2020. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 8/28/2020. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (UNSIGNED) by Nathaniel T. Brent. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MDOC Mississippi Department of Corrections, MTC Management Training Corp., WCCF Wilkinson County Correctional Facility, filed by Nathaniel T. Brent. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brent v. MTC Management Training Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Management Training Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCCF Wilkinson County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDOC Mississippi Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel T. Brent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?