Belton v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Belton
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Store #816 and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00203
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 1/15/21. (KPM)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Wal-Mart Store #816, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Store #816, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Theresa Belton (Harness, Jeffery)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Theresa Belton (Harness, Jeffery)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Theresa Belton (Harness, Jeffery)
November 11, 2020 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendants Wal-Mart Store #816, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Store #816, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Store #816, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Store #816, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from Lincoln County Circuit Court, case number CI 2020-0330-LS. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4406249) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to RFA, #4 Exhibit C - Process, pleadings, etc. served on Walmart, #5 Exhibit D - Walmart's RFA to Plaintiff)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belton v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Store #816
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Belton
Represented By: Jeffery K. Harness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?