Banks v. Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rickey Banks doing business as Banks' IT Services doing business as Banks Professional Services, LLC
Defendant: Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc., Regina Reed, James Walker and Arnell Harried
Case Number: 5:2021cv00081
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. (AB)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Arnell Harried, Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc., Regina Reed, James Walker.(Bobadilla, Doris)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc..(Bobadilla, Doris)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 10/01/2021 (KNS)
October 1, 2021 Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RHWR on future filings. (KNS) Modified on 10/1/2021 (VM).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 10/14/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/29/21 (HM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Williams on behalf of Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc. (Williams, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc. (Bobadilla, Doris)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rickey Banks. Arnell Harried served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Watson, Louis)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rickey Banks. James Walker served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Watson, Louis)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rickey Banks. Regina Reed served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Watson, Louis)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rickey Banks. Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc. served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Watson, Louis)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Rickey Banks (Norris, Robert)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Arnell Harried, Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc., Regina Reed, James Walker. (LAT)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Arnell Harried, Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc., Regina Reed, James Walker ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4646878), filed by Rickey Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Signed copy of Information Technology Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- Copy of Letter from Defendant JCHC provided Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Banks doing business as Banks' IT Services doing business as Banks Professional Services, LLC
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Nicholas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Comprehensive Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Doris Theresa Bobadilla
Represented By: Matthew M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Reed
Represented By: Doris Theresa Bobadilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker
Represented By: Doris Theresa Bobadilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnell Harried
Represented By: Doris Theresa Bobadilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?