Williams, Jr. v. Mississippi Department of Correction/Managment and Training Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Raymondo LeonLove Williams, Jr.
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Correction/Managment and Training Corporation, Scott Middlebrooks, John Hunt, Burl Cain, Gary Young, William DeRevere, Tracey Arbuthnot and Matthew Schoettmer
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 5:2021cv00099
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (copy mailed to plaintiff). (VM)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00142. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 Case Transferred to Southern District. Transferred electronically via CM/ECF. CASE CLOSED. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Raymondo LeonLove Williams, Jr. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Raymondo LeonLove Williams, Jr. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
November 23, 2021 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. District Judge Debra M. Brown no longer assigned to the case. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 11/25/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2021. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymondo LeonLove Williams, Jr. (cb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Raymondo LeonLove Williams, Jr.. (cb) Modified on 10/26/2021 (cb). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 12/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Jr. v. Mississippi Department of Correction/Managment and Training Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymondo LeonLove Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Correction/Managment and Training Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Middlebrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William DeRevere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Arbuthnot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Schoettmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?