Turner v. Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Turner
Defendant: Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC and Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv00074
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: Bradley W Rath
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees and Litigation Expenses filed by Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC (Wyly, James)
October 6, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees and Litigation Expenses by Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC (Wyly, James)
October 6, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC (Wyly, James)
October 6, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC.(Wyly, James)
October 4, 2023 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC (Harold, Edward)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC's Motion #14 for Second Extension of Time Within Which to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC's deadline to file a pleading responsive to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is now October 14, 2023. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 10/4/2023 (rjc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Preservation of Rule 12 Defenses by Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC (Wyly, James)
September 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC (Holland, Drury)
September 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Wyly, III on behalf of Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC (Wyly, James)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC's Motion #10 for Extension of Time Within Which to File Responsive Pleadings as unopposed. Defendant Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC's answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is now due on October 5, 2023. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 9/18/2023 (rjc)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC's Unopposed Motion #13 for Enlargement of Time and Preservation of Rule 12 Defenses. Defendant Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC's answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is now due on October 6, 2023. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 9/18/2023 (rjc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harold, Edward)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney Patrick A. Barthle, II be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Andrea Turner in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 9/15/2023 (AB)
September 15, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 10: Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.).(cwl)
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Patrick A. Barthle, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5213672) by Andrea Turner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kelly, Bradley)
August 31, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Turner. (Kelly, Bradley)
August 31, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Turner. (Kelly, Bradley)
August 30, 2023 Filing 6 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Turner. Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (Kelly, Bradley) Modified on 8/30/2023 (VM).
August 30, 2023 Filing 5 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Turner. Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC served on 8/28/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Kelly, Bradley) Modified on 8/30/2023 (VM).
August 30, 2023 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #5 and #6 : Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attorney is directed to refile and may attach documents #5 and #6 as exhibits with a description. (VM)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response providing citizenship of Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 8/10/2023 (rjc) filed by Andrea Turner (Kelly, Bradley)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response providing citizenship of Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 8/10/2023 (rjc)
August 9, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC, Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC. (KNS)
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC, Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5183295), filed by Andrea Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Turner
Represented By: Bradley Smith Kelly
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle, II - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater Franchise Group, LLC
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alford, Holloway, & Smith, PLLC
Represented By: Drury Sumner Holland
Represented By: James G. Wyly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?