BNSF Railway Company v. Quad City Testing Laboratory
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: Quad City Testing Laboratory
Case Number: 1:2007cv00170
Filed: December 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 110 Defendant's Motion in Limine re Kenneth Smith Testimony. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 10/28/2010. (EMA)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re 108 Defendant's Motion in Limine seeking to exclude testimony of Robert Sheridan. The Court RESERVES ruling on Sheridan's 8/24/05 Letter until FPTC. The court DENIES Defendant's Motion in that Sheridan will be permitted to testify as a fact witness re non-confidential mediation matters. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 10/26/2010. (EMA)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine re Testimony of Lay Witnesses Kuntz, Burr and Kutzler. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 9/27/2010. (EMA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company v. Quad City Testing Laboratory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Kristine J. Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quad City Testing Laboratory
Represented By: Gary L. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?