Flagstone Development, LLC et al v. Joyner et al
Plaintiff: Flagstone Development, LLC and Lawrence Heath
Defendant: Wayne Joyner, Justin Joyner, Rocky Mountain Timberlands, Inc. and John Does 1 thru 10
Case Number: 1:2008cv00100
Filed: September 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 540 JUDGMENT in favor of Rocky Mountain Timberlands against Flagstone Development, LLC. (AMC)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDERED: 1. Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss for Fatal Lack of Allowable and Proven Damages, is GRANTED in part. 2. This case will be dismissed on January 26, 2018, unless the plaintiff establishes good cause of record, supported by reliable admissible evidence, why such dismissal should not be ordered. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/16/2018. (HEG)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS FOR the remaining damages phase trial. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/25/2017. (AMC)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDERED: in the interest of expediting trial and disposition of issues, Plaintiff is expected to remove from its "will offer" exhibit list to be attached to the final pretrial order to be filed on or before 9/8/2017, and and all exhibits that were to have been offered in connection with or in support of testimony from either Foley or Sacry. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/6/2017. (DED)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDERED The expert testimony of James R. Foley and Sheryl Sacry, CPA isEXCLUDED. Neither will be permitted to testify as an expert witness at trial. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/31/2017. (AMC)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER DENYING 505 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/23/2017. (AMC)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER granting 470 Motion. Hearing set for 11/30/16 will be on the record telephonically. Counsel to file notice on or before 11/29/16, stating number at which he or she may be reached. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/22/2016. (DED, )
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER admitting Plaintiff's exhibits 1-10,12-14,16,18-21, 23-35, 40,42-58, 60,64-66, 69,72-77, 81,83,85,88,90,106,110,111,114-124,127,129,139,140,142 without objection. Admissibility of other "will offer" exhibits will be addressed, and to extent feasible, ruled on prior to trial at a hearing to be set by further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/2/2016. (DED, )
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDERED: 1. On or before October 21, 2016, Plaintiffs shall file a May Offer Exhibit List and a May Call Witness List, if applicable. 2. On or before October 21, 2016, Defendants shall file a May Offer Exhibit list, if applicable. 3. Each party sh all file its additional exhibits in the electronic record, deliver the original and one copy of the documents exhibits to the Clerk of Court, and mail an additional copy of exhibits to Chambers, 901 Front Street, Suite 3100 A, Helena, Montana, 59626, on or before October 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/13/2016. (HEG, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting 197 Defendant Developer Finance Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 241 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 12/19/2011. (EMA)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting 166 Defendants Jon Ussin d/b/a U Bar S Real Estate and 196 Nicholas Powers III Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 11/21/2011. (EMA)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting 190 Wayne Joyner, Justin Joyner and Rocky Mountain Timberland's Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 188 Justin Joyner Individual Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 11/7/2011. (EMA)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting 214 American Title and Escrow's Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 266 Motion to Strike Affidavit; finding as moot 200 Motion for Determination of Plaintiffs' Privilege Claims; finding as moot 220 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 11/3/2011. (EMA)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting 209 American Title & Escrow's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dale Grabois; and granting 210 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 10/24/2011. (EMA)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 192 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Jake Korell and Landmark of Billings, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 9/28/2011. (EMA)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 114 Defendant First American Title Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 1/18/2011. (EMA)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 105 Defendants Jon Ussin and U Bar S Real Estate's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 10/19/2010. (EMA)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 68 Defendant American Title & Escrow's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 8/16/2010. (EMA) Modified on 8/16/2010 to indicate a copy mailed to Wayne Marchwick (ACL, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flagstone Development, LLC et al v. Joyner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flagstone Development, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Coil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Heath
Represented By: Michael C. Coil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Timberlands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 thru 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?