Mountain West Holding v. The State of Montana

Plaintiff: Mountain West Holding
Defendant: The State of Montana, The Montana Department of Transportation and Mike Tooley
Case Number: 1:2013cv00049
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2018 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/14/2018. (AMC)
February 15, 2018 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 165 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonically. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/15/2018. (ASG)
February 1, 2018 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 150 Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Rule 60 Motion for Relief from the January 30, 2018 Order (Doc. 150) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall adhere to an expedited briefing schedule on the matter of reconsideration. Defendants shall file their motion for reconsideration by February 5, 2018 and Plaintiff shall have until February 9, 2018, to file a response. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/1/2018. (AMC)
January 30, 2018 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 116 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENIED, SUBJECT TO RENEWAL AT TRIAL 124 Motion in Limine; DENIED, SUBJECT TO RENEWAL AT TRIAL 126 Motion in Limine; DENIED, SUBJECT TO RENEWAL AT T RIAL 128 Motion in Limine; GRANTING 139 Motion to Amend/Correct Plaintiff shall immediately file its second amended complaint, and the State shall file an answer by February 9, 2018. RESERVE RULING ON 141 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/30/2018. (AMC)
November 26, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 48 Motion in Limine; granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 58 Motion to Strike ; denying 64 Motion to Strike ; denying 66 Motion to Strike ; denying 79 Motion to Strike ; denying 89 Motion to Strike. Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/26/2014. (dle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain West Holding v. The State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain West Holding
Represented By: Casey Heitz
Represented By: Gary Lofland
Represented By: Mark D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Montana Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?