DeVries v. Pioneer Wireline Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenton DeVries
Defendant: Pioneer Wireline Services, LLC and John Does I-V
Case Number: 1:2014cv00123
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kenton DeVries. IT IS RECOMMENDED that DeVries'summary judgment motion (ECF 20 ) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 8/18/2015. (JDR, )
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION & ORDER adopting 10 Findings and Recommendations IN FULL. Defendant Pioneer Wireline Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss 4 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/12/2015. (EMH, )
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pioneer Wireline Services, LLC. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Pioneer's motion to dismiss (ECF 4 ) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 12/10/2014. (JDH, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeVries v. Pioneer Wireline Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenton DeVries
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Janna Marie Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Wireline Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?