Jacques v. Haas Group International, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas P. Jacques
Defendant: Wesco Aircraft Holdings Inc. and Haas Group International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00135
Filed: October 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING 131 Motion for Attorney Fees. Jacques is entitled to $40,532.10 in attorney's fees and $37, 119.11 in costs in addition to his taxable costs of $17,784.09. READ ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/22/2017. (AMC)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re 131 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Thomas P. Jacques. Jacques is ordered to disclose the terms of his fee agreement for the services for which the claim is made. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/23/2017. (AMC)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING 138 Motion Leave to Register the Judgment Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/6/2017. (AMC)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 JUDGMENT in favor of Thomas P. Jacques against Haas Group International, LLC. (AMC)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDERED that the parties shall submit simultaneous briefing on the factors based on the record before the Court. Briefs are due 14 days from the date of this Order. (Brief in Response to Order due by 11/21/2016 ) Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/7/2016. (AMC, )
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 122 Motion to Seal document 56-23. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/1/2016. (EMH, )
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEALS AND LODGING ORDER Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/28/2016. (EMH, )
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ALLOWING ELECTRONICS Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/24/2016. (Copy to CSO) (EMH, )
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiffs Exhibit 102 is EXCLUDED from trial. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/19/2016. (EMH, )
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 96 Motion to File Under Seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the lodged sealed document filed in connection with the motion shall be kept under seal until otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/19/2016. (EMH, )
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re ruling on parties objections to designated portions of witness depositions 81 (81-2, 81-5) filed by Thomas P. Jacques. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/18/2016. (EMH, )
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER, Jacques' 71 MOTION in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Haas' 73 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Exhibit 70 is DENIED in part and RESERVED in part for further ruling. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/14/2016. (EMH, )
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER- COUNSEL SHOULD BE PREPARED TO ARGUE THE MOTIONS AT THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE in re 73 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Exhibit 70 filed by Haas Group International Inc., 71 MOTION in Limine filed by Thomas P. Jacques Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/3/2016. (AMC, )
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL AND DENYING 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/25/2016. (AMC, )
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Haas Group International Inc. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Haas'motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 45 ) be DENIED in all respects, and that the Court set this matter for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 1/25/2016. (JDR, ) Modified on 1/25/2016 to change to opinion (JDR, ).
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 57 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 1/12/2016. (cp) (NOB) Modified on 1/12/2016 to add link. (NOB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacques v. Haas Group International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas P. Jacques
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Represented By: Tom Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco Aircraft Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haas Group International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?