Wittman et al v. CB1, Inc.

Plaintiff: William Wittman and Amber Bellamy
Defendant: CB1, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00105
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER- Read order for details Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/24/2017. (AMC)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 33 Findings and Recommendations.; denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/1/2016. (SLL, )
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CB1, Inc. IT IS RECOMMENDED that CB1's motion to dismiss and strike class allegations be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 4/8/2016. (JDR, ) Modified on 4/8/2016 to add text and regenerate NEF (JDR, ).
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; denying 16 Motion REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; granting 21 Motion for Hearing. The Court will hear oral argument on the motion to dismiss on Friday, March 25, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 2/18/2016. (JDR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wittman et al v. CB1, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wittman
Represented By: D. Michael Eakin
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Bellamy
Represented By: D. Michael Eakin
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB1, Inc.
Represented By: Martin Steve Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?