Underberg v. Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Donna M. Underberg
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv00112
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: PRAIRIE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (AEC)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. It is hereby Ordered that the Scheduling Order 30 is AMENDED as follows: Discovery due by 3/21/2018, Motions deadline by 5/3/2018, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Fina l Pretrial Conference and Trial set for 6/18/2018 is VACATED. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/4/2017 at 11:30 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/19/2017. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. (AEC)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING TELEPHONIC PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Updated Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/14/2017; Updated Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/14/2017; Updated Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/14/2017. TELEPHONIC Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2017 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/11/2017. (JDR)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: EMC'S 4 Motion to Transfer Venue 4 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 4/14/2016. (NOB)(cp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underberg v. Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Underberg
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Cook
Represented By: James M. Ragain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?