Majestic Homes, Inc v. Hurt
Plaintiff: Majestic Homes, Inc
Defendant: Rose Hurt
Case Number: 1:2016cv00008
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 61 Motion for Attorney Fees for Plaintiff. Majestic Homes is entitled to 12,784.00 in attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/23/2018. (AMC)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Majestic Homes, Inc against Rose Hurt. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/2/2018. (EMH)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/12/2018. (EMH)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying Plaintiff Majestic Home's 34 Motion for entry of final judgment. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/23/2017. (EMH)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL AND GRANTING 16 Motion for PARTIAL Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/31/2017. (AMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majestic Homes, Inc v. Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majestic Homes, Inc
Represented By: Adam J. Tunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Hurt
Represented By: Mark C. Sherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?