Armitage v. Caliber Home Loans Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Armitage
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Bank of America, NA and First American Title Company of Montana, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00027
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: CARBON
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant's against Plaintiff. (AMC)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice FOR ATTORNEY AARON R. GOLDSTEIN. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/20/2017. (AMC)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The parties may file a new motion and affidavit complying with L.R. 83.l(d)(A) through (J) in the above captioned matter. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/19/2017. (FINANCE notified to provide refund) (EMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armitage v. Caliber Home Loans Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Armitage
Represented By: Anthony W. Kendall
Represented By: Raymond G. Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Michael J. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company of Montana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?