Leep v. Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Landy C. Leep
Defendant: Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Third_party_defendant: Sprague Construction Roofing, LLC
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00057
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs of suit and attorneys fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/30/2018. (AMC)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER. This case has settled and no issue remains for determination. Dismissal Papers due by 4/28/2018. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and any pending deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/29/2018. (JDR)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Order and all deadlines set forth in the 5/5/2017 Scheduling Order are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/24/2017. (JDR)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/6/2017. (AEC)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED as to Count Two of Complaint, and DENIED as to Count One. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/28/2017. (AEC) Modified on 3/28/2017 to correct docket text(AEC).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leep v. Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landy C. Leep
Represented By: W. Scott Green
Represented By: Daniel L. Snedigar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Cile Glover Rogers
Represented By: Ross Daniel Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Sprague Construction Roofing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Cile Glover Rogers
Represented By: Ross Daniel Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?