Mickealson v. Cummins, Inc

Plaintiff: Ross Mickealson
Defendant: Cummins, Inc
Case Number: 1:2016cv00075
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 47 Objection. For the reasons in the order, the Court DENIES Mickealson's motion for review of the clerk's memorandum on taxation of costs (Doc. 47). Further, IT IS ORDERED that Cummins is entitled to recover $5,146.05 in costs. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/10/2018. (AMC)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion for Review of Clerk's Memorandum of Taxation of Costs. The Clerk of Court is ordered to re-tax the costs in this matter consistent with this order. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/19/2018. (AMC)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (AMC)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File of Dispositive Motion Deadline filed by Cummins, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/16/2017. (AEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mickealson v. Cummins, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Mickealson
Represented By: Veronica A. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Beck
Represented By: Sarah V. Bowers
Represented By: Leonard H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?