Baker v. Sunburst Consulting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brock Baker
Defendant: Sunburst Consulting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00124
Filed: August 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. The parties to bear their own fees and costs as provided in the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/9/2018. (AMC)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Vacate and Extending Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/11/2017. (JDR)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IR IS ORDERED that the proposed 36 Findings and Recommendations entered by United States Magistrate Judge Cavan are ADOPTED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 23 Motion for conditional certification and notice is GRANTED. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/1/2017. (EMH)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David I. Moulton for Brock Baker. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/8/2017. (JDR)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Carolyn S. Ostby. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/28/2016. (AMC, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Sunburst Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Baker
Represented By: Richard (Rex) J. Burch
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunburst Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?