McFerrin v. United Speciality Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Carmen L. McFerrin
Defendant: United Speciality Insurance Company, Bishop Barry, Andrew A. Goode, Rebecca B. Aherne and Parker, Heitz & Cosgrove, PLLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00146
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/8/2017. (AMC)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Upon the Plaintiffs Notice of Settlement (Doc. 49), and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines are VACATED and any pending motions are DENIED as moot Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/2/2017. (EMH)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REGARDING 47 STIPULATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/30/2017. (JDR)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING 40 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/29/2016. (JDR)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Carolyn S. Ostby Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/27/2016. (AMC, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFerrin v. United Speciality Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen L. McFerrin
Represented By: Alexander Blewett, III
Represented By: Anders Blewett, IV
Represented By: Kurt M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Speciality Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert K. Baldwin
Represented By: James Devlan Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop Barry
Represented By: Robert K. Baldwin
Represented By: James Devlan Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew A. Goode
Represented By: Robert K. Baldwin
Represented By: James Devlan Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca B. Aherne
Represented By: Robert K. Baldwin
Represented By: James Devlan Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker, Heitz & Cosgrove, PLLC
Represented By: Robert K. Baldwin
Represented By: James Devlan Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?