Lenhardt v. Sysco Corporation
Plaintiff: Tracy Lenhardt
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00153
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND MODIFIED IN PART FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Sysco's request to STAY THE CASE PENDING MANDATORY ARBITRATION IS GRANTED and Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO RENEW FOLLOWING ARBITRATION 12 . Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/28/2017. (AMC)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Hearing; denying 20 Motion for Oral Argument Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/10/2017. (JDR)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watter and is REFERRED to the Honorable Carolyn S. Ostby Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/17/2016. (AMC, )
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATE COURT ORDER VACATING HEARING. (JDR, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenhardt v. Sysco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lenhardt
Represented By: Charles R. Cashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?